Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Wells Fargo Bank Na, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wooters, Meridith H, against Delancey Street Ltd, Dorfman, Jan M, The United States Of America Department Of Treasury Internal Revenue Service, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with PAGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2023 |
CategoryComplaint In Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedFebruary 02, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
January 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Praec to Reinstate | |
January 22, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
January 17, 2024 | Docket Event | Motion for Alternate Service with Mem of Law & Affidavit | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint In Mortgage Foreclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.