Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Wilmington Savings Fund Society Fsb As Owner Trustee Of Csmc 2022-Rpl4 Trust, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Wendt, Robert P, against Roddenberry, John A, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts Magisterial District with STEVEN C. TOLLIVER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 28, 2023 |
CategoryComplaint In Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 19, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseMagisterial District |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 28, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Scheduling | |
January 31, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Scheduling | |
December 14, 2023 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Scheduling | |
November 28, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint In Mortgage Foreclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.