Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Schweiger, Karin, against Grau, Joseph W, Grau, Lizzie, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts Magisterial District with STEVEN C. TOLLIVER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryComplaint In Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedMay 29, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseMagisterial District |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 29, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certification | |
May 20, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Entered in Favor of | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certification | |
March 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Praec-Writ Mortgage Foreclosure & 3129 Affidavit | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
December 08, 2023 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.