Case Last Refreshed: 3 weeks ago
Lakeview Loan Servicing Llc, filed a(n) Foreclosure - Property case represented by Schweiger, Karin, against Gehman, Brittany Lynn, Sharpless, Michael W, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts Magisterial District with GAIL A. WEILHEIMER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryComplaint In Mortgage Foreclosure |
Last RefreshedJune 03, 2024 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeForeclosure |
Filing Court HouseMagisterial District |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue For Cases Filed 1993 & Above | |
February 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
January 30, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
January 18, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
December 06, 2023 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
December 05, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Scheduling | |
November 21, 2023 | Docket Event | Complaint In Mortgage Foreclosure |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.