Case Last Refreshed: 1 month ago
Davis, Quann, filed a(n) Complaint Civil Action case represented by Sacchetta, Thomas F, against Arbor Material Handling, Doe S I-X, John, The Raymond Corporation, represented by Patitsas, Magda, Ricci, William J, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts Magisterial District with GARRETT D. PAGE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 21, 2023 |
CategoryComplaint Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 21, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Filing Court HouseMagisterial District |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Praec for Substitution of | |
May 21, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Returned Copy | |
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Praec to Attach | |
May 16, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer & New Matter by | |
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
May 14, 2024 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
April 24, 2024 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
February 05, 2024 | Docket Event | Reply |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.