Case Last Refreshed: 2 weeks ago
Srs Distribution Inc, filed a(n) Complaint Civil Action case represented by Keifer, Richard W Iii, against Geobest Construction Llc, Turabelidze, Irakli, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with GARY SILOW presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMay 12, 2022 |
CategoryComplaint Civil Action |
Last RefreshedApril 13, 2024 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 12, 2024 | Docket Event | Attachment Dissolved/Discontinued | |
February 08, 2024 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
February 06, 2024 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
January 25, 2024 | Docket Event | Praec-Writ of Execution Money Judgment w/ Garnishee | |
November 23, 2022 | Docket Event | Certificate Pre Requisite Rule 4009.22 | |
September 06, 2022 | Docket Event | Attachment Dissolved/Discontinued | |
August 26, 2022 | Docket Event | Answer to Interrogatories By | |
August 15, 2022 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
August 12, 2022 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
August 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Interrogatories To |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.