Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Halstead, Kristin, Halstead, Thomas M, filed a(n) 12/2/2022 case represented by Vaccaro, Joseph, against Tru Basement Waterproofing Inc, represented by Gallagher, James F Jr, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with No presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateSeptember 07, 2021 |
Category12/2/2022 |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 02, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue For Cases Filed 1993 & Above | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
November 19, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Reply to New Matter | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
October 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
September 30, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
September 27, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer & New Matter Counterclaim by | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
September 13, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint In |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.