Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Eirng, Vouthy, filed a(n) 1/24/2022 case represented by Kipperman, Alexander, against Giambattista, Michael, Giambattista, Tina, Miranda Graf, Devan, represented by Oprysko, Jennifer R, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with No presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateSeptember 03, 2021 |
Category1/24/2022 |
Last RefreshedAugust 09, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 24, 2022 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue For Cases Filed 1993 & Above | |
November 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Praecipe | |
November 12, 2021 | Docket Event | Answer & New Matter by | |
November 11, 2021 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
November 01, 2021 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Demand for Jury Trial by | |
October 20, 2021 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
September 22, 2021 | Docket Event | Praec to Reinstate | |
September 03, 2021 | Docket Event | Complaint Civil Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.