Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with Gary S. Silow presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateNovember 29, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 14, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 04, 2019 | Docket Event | Terminated | |
August 29, 2019 | Docket Event | Notice To Terminate | |
November 30, 2016 | Docket Event | Divorce Decree | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Defendants Signature | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Non-Military Service | |
November 29, 2016 | Docket Event | Praec to Transmit/ 2 Certs | |
July 25, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Consent By | |
July 20, 2016 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Consent By | |
May 24, 2016 | Docket Event | Stipulation |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.