Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
Skyline Park Citizen Association, Inc., filed a(n) Unlawful Detainer - Property case represented by Gravett, Charles Lewis, Iii, against Troughton, Gary N., in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts with Francisca P. Tisher presiding.
Case Number |
||
Filing DateApril 18, 2008 |
CategoryUnlawful Detainer Residential Limited (32) - Under 10,000 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaProperty |
Time to Dismissal Following Dispositive Motions21 days |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeUnlawful Detainer |
|
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time21 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 04, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Filed) 236120-Writ: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: FILED [236120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Writ (Issued) 236110-Writ: Issued Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff WRIT: ISSUED [236110] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 12, 2008 | Docket Event |
Court Trial: Short Cause 251110-Court Trial: Short Cause; Skyline Park Citizen Association, Inc. vs. Troughton, G. ; Judge: J21160 Tisher Francisca P. Judge: Tisher, Francisca P. |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment: Default 226130-Judgment: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff JUDGMENT: DEFAULT [226130] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
May 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: May 9 2008 Type: 244210 - Judgment: Clerk Default Manner : 241210 - Before Trial: No Sttlmnt Cnf/ADR |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service: Summons DLR (Civil) 212320-Proof of Service: Summons (DLR) Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff PROOF OF SERVICE: SUMMONS (DLR) [212320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 229120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff REQUEST: DEFAULT [229120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
|
April 18, 2008 | Docket Event |
Summons Issued / Filed 222120-Summons: Filed Filed/Issued By: 931210 - Attorney for Plaintiff SUMMONS: FILED [222120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR PLAINTIFF [931210] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.