Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Arrow Financial Services Llc, filed a(n) Complaint Civil Action case represented by Santucci, Daniel, against Creciun, Michael, Anthony, Karen, represented by Spirt, H David, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with ALBRIGHT presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2009 |
CategoryComplaint Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2009 | Docket Event | Praec to Withdraw | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
July 09, 2009 | Docket Event | Preliminary Objections of | |
June 18, 2009 | Docket Event | Amended Complaint | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Preliminary Objections of | |
June 04, 2009 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Not Found as to | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
March 16, 2009 | Docket Event | Praec to Reinstate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.