Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Worldwide Express, Fusion Partners Inc, filed a(n) Complaint Civil Action case represented by Cherwony, Robert E, against Legendary Art Llc, Penn Corp, represented by Jokelson, Neil E, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with MOORE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 31, 2008 |
CategoryComplaint Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 03, 2012 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue For Cases Filed 1993 & Above | |
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event | Order | |
April 02, 2009 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Praec to Attach | |
March 30, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Law | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Petition to Open/Strike Judgment | |
March 27, 2009 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Entered in Favor of | |
March 11, 2009 | Docket Event | Certification of Addresses |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.