Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Marchozzi, Joseph, filed a(n) Complaint Civil Action case represented by Costigan, Richard, against Giancaterino, Morisa, Giancaterino, Cynthia, Giancaterino, Vinae A, represented by Cicalese, Heather, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with NICHOLAS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 28, 2007 |
CategoryComplaint Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 31, 2008 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue For Cases Filed 1993 & Above | |
June 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 06, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
May 05, 2008 | Docket Event | Rule | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Motion | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Memorandum of Law | |
April 30, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
April 04, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate Pre Requisite Rule 4009.22 | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Certificate of Service | |
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event | Answer & New Matter by |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.