Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Salvi, Hope, Salvi, Ivo, filed a(n) Complaint-Civil Action case represented by Grossman, Jeffrey T, against Dell Props, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 27, 2002 |
CategoryComplaint-Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 12, 2005 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
May 13, 2005 | Docket Event | Terminated | |
February 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice To Terminate | |
January 28, 2003 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
January 27, 2003 | Docket Event | Praecipe | |
December 27, 2002 | Docket Event | Complaint Civil Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.