Case Last Refreshed: 4 months ago
Abington Twp Treasurer, Solomon, Max M, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Herder, Robert R, against Angelos Auto, Rose, Angelo J, represented by Halpin, Charles A J Iii, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with ROSSANESE presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2002 |
CategoryAppeal From District Justice |
Last RefreshedDecember 08, 2023 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Praecipe to Discontinue For Cases Filed 1993 & Above | |
April 18, 2023 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Re-Open | |
March 03, 2023 | Docket Event | Order - Other | |
October 01, 2010 | Docket Event | Terminated | |
April 29, 2010 | Docket Event | Notice To Terminate | |
December 24, 2007 | Docket Event | Received Record | |
October 29, 2007 | Docket Event | Received Opinion | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Papers forwarded to | |
January 30, 2007 | Docket Event | Service List/Record Documents |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.