Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lintellsmith, Diane Estelle, Deantonio, Diane, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case against Deantonio, Frank H, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with WEILHEIMER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 04, 2002 |
CategoryComplaint In Divorce |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
January 07, 2014 | Docket Event | Closed after Advertising | |
August 28, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination Returned | |
August 13, 2013 | Docket Event | Notice To Terminate | |
February 12, 2011 | Docket Event | Praec to Change Address | |
February 11, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 10, 2011 | Docket Event | Order | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Emergency Family Petition | |
February 07, 2011 | Docket Event | Custody Mediation Compliance/Non Certification | |
August 26, 2009 | Docket Event | Notice to Retake Prior Surname | |
July 11, 2007 | Docket Event | Praecipe |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.