Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
3 D Auto Parts Inc, Delcollo, J, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case against Tommys Paving, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 13, 2002 |
CategoryAppeal From District Justice |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 10, 2005 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Terminated | |
December 16, 2004 | Docket Event | Notice To Terminate | |
December 13, 2002 | Docket Event | Proof of Service of Notice of Appeal | |
December 03, 2002 | Docket Event | Praec to Enter Rule to File Complaint | |
December 03, 2002 | Docket Event | Appeal from District Justice |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.