Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Patriot Comml Leasing Co Inc, filed a(n) Summons-Civil Action case represented by Meingossner, Robert P, against Levy, Shalom, Greenburg, Hillary, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with TRESSLER presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 02, 2002 |
CategorySummons-Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 25, 2008 | Docket Event | Closed after Advertising | |
August 16, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination Returned | |
August 15, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice of Termination Returned | |
August 13, 2007 | Docket Event | Notice To Terminate | |
April 15, 2005 | Docket Event | Statement Of Intention To Proceed | |
March 14, 2005 | Docket Event | Notice To Terminate | |
February 19, 2003 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
January 23, 2003 | Docket Event | Praec to Reissue Writ | |
December 02, 2002 | Docket Event | Summons Civil Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.