Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Cooper, Sandra, filed a(n) Complaint-Civil Action case represented by Saffren, Kenneth S, against Kramont Realty Tr, Royce Realty Inc, Kramont Realty Tr Inc, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with HODGSON presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2002 |
CategoryComplaint-Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
August 26, 2002 | Docket Event | Order to Settle Discontinue and End 1993 and Above | |
July 16, 2002 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
July 10, 2002 | Docket Event | Praec for Substitution of | |
July 05, 2002 | Docket Event | Complaint Civil Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.