Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bildner, Anna Marie, filed a(n) Complaint-Civil Action case represented by Liss, Steven A, against Pacific Motor Transport Co, Tambuerrino, Vito Livio, represented by Mitchell, Jason A, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with DICKMAN presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2002 |
CategoryComplaint-Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
August 05, 2002 | Docket Event | Order to Settle Discontinue and End 1993 and Above | |
June 18, 2001 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint By | |
June 18, 2001 | Docket Event | Certification | |
May 09, 2001 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
May 09, 2001 | Docket Event | Certification | |
May 04, 2001 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certificate of Service of | |
April 30, 2001 | Docket Event | Affidavit/Certification | |
April 10, 2001 | Docket Event | Complaint Civil Action |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.