Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Barker, Randy, Barker Scott, filed a(n) General Appeals - Appeals case represented by Grolnick, Robert T, against Barker, Randy, Barker, Scott, Harmon, Jeffrey S, represented by Bragitikos, Rachel S, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with SALUS presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2002 |
CategoryAppeal From District Justice |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2021 |
Practice AreaAppeals |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeGeneral Appeals |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
April 30, 2002 | Docket Event | Restored from Purged File | |
September 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
August 06, 2001 | Docket Event | Order to Settle Discontinue and End 1993 and Above | |
April 17, 2001 | Docket Event | Reply to New Matter | |
April 09, 2001 | Docket Event | Certification | |
April 09, 2001 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
March 22, 2001 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served | |
March 20, 2001 | Docket Event | Answer & Counterclaim by | |
March 06, 2001 | Docket Event | (Internal Use Only) Served |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.