Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Vasoli, Glenna I, filed a(n) Divorce,Separation - Family case represented by Nocchi, Marguerite M, against Vasoli, Thomas A, represented by Leonard, Suzan G, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with WALL presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 14, 2002 |
CategoryComplaint In Divorce |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
Matter TypeDivorce,Separation |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Closed after Advertising | |
June 15, 2006 | Docket Event | Praec to Withdraw | |
May 24, 2006 | Docket Event | Order for Hearing | |
May 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Order | |
May 10, 2006 | Docket Event | Answer/Response | |
March 22, 2006 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
March 17, 2006 | Docket Event | Praecipe | |
March 14, 2006 | Docket Event | Petition | |
December 14, 2002 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
August 01, 2000 | Docket Event | Order |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.