Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with Gail A. Weilheimer presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeGail A. Weilheimer Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 23, 1998 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 16, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 23, 2015 | Docket Event | Closed after Advertising | |
June 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Withdrawal of Appearance of | |
June 30, 2000 | Docket Event | Entry of Appearance | |
June 29, 2000 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
June 29, 2000 | Docket Event | Order | |
June 23, 2000 | Docket Event | Decree in Favor of | |
June 08, 2000 | Docket Event | Correction | |
June 02, 2000 | Docket Event | Restored from Purged File | |
May 08, 2000 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
July 08, 1999 | Docket Event | Notice Of Hearing |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.