Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
filed a(n) case in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with SMYTH presiding.
Case Number |
Judge |
Filing DateDecember 11, 1998 |
|
Last RefreshedFebruary 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
May 08, 2000 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
May 20, 1999 | Docket Event | Notice to Retake Prior Surname | |
April 28, 1999 | Docket Event | Notice Mailed | |
April 28, 1999 | Docket Event | Decree in Favor of | |
April 09, 1999 | Docket Event | Waiver | |
April 09, 1999 | Docket Event | Affidavit of Consent By | |
April 09, 1999 | Docket Event | Praec to Transmit/ 2 Certs | |
March 24, 1999 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service By | |
February 19, 1999 | Docket Event | Acceptance of Service By | |
December 11, 1998 | Docket Event | Praec to Reinstate |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.