Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Sims, Patricia, Atkins, Elton, filed a(n) Complaint-Civil Action case represented by Halpern, Susan P, against Anderson, Kenneth R, represented by Munger, Michael S, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts with HODGSON presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeHODGSON Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 11, 1998 |
CategoryComplaint-Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 06, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
July 11, 2001 | Docket Event | Removed From Active Files | |
May 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Satisfied -For Cases Filed After 1992 | |
March 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Notice 236 Required Document Mailed | |
March 14, 2001 | Docket Event | Default Judgment Entered in Favor of | |
February 02, 2001 | Docket Event | Award of Arbitration findings for | |
August 29, 2000 | Docket Event | Praec for Arbitration | |
March 06, 2000 | Docket Event | Certificate Pre Requisite Rule 4009.22 | |
December 21, 1999 | Docket Event | Depositions of | |
January 25, 1999 | Docket Event | Order | |
December 11, 1998 | Docket Event | Motion |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.