Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Haab F C Co Inc, filed a(n) Complaint-Civil Action case represented by Wollman, Milton A, against Seamco Inc, in the jurisdiction of Montgomery County, PA, . Montgomery County, PA Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 20, 1985 |
CategoryComplaint-Civil Action |
Last RefreshedMay 07, 2021 |
|
Filing LocationMontgomery County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 08, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Copy | |
April 07, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Copy | |
March 26, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 16, 2015 | Docket Event | Returned Copy | |
March 04, 2015 | Docket Event | Order | |
March 03, 1986 | Docket Event | Stipulation | |
February 13, 1986 | Docket Event | Ord. Sur Motion for Sanctions | |
January 24, 1986 | Docket Event | Ord. Sur Motion for Sanctions | |
December 20, 1985 | Docket Event | Motion For Sanctions And Rule | |
May 20, 1985 | Docket Event | Answer to Complaint By |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.