Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Bailor, Terry L., filed a(n) case against A.C.R., Llc, Lewistown, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 06, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to A.C.r., Llc, Defendant |
|
December 05, 2006 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
November 30, 2006 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
November 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to A.C.r., Llc, Defendant |
|
November 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to A.C.r., Llc, Defendant |
|
November 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Allen Joseph Levin, Esq. Applies to Terry L. Bailor, Plaintiff |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Daniel Zinn Searer, Esq. Applies to A.C.r., Llc, Defendant |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to A.C.r., Llc, Defendant |
|
November 07, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to A.C.r., Llc, Defendant |
|
November 06, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Cross Complaint Filed Filed by Terry L. Bailor Applies to A.C.r., Llc, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.