Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Kelly & Son, Mcveytown, filed a(n) case against Mckenna, Frank, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 23, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 01, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Defendant Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Frank McKenna, Defendant |
|
July 27, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by John Herrington McCullough, Esq. Applies to Kelly & Son, Plaintiff |
|
July 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Joseph P. Green, Esq. Applies to Frank McKenna, Defendant |
|
July 13, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
May 04, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
April 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Frank McKenna, Defendant |
|
April 28, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Frank McKenna, Defendant |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Frank McKenna, Defendant |
|
April 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Frank McKenna, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.