Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Palisades Collection,Llc Assgn At&T, Camp Hill, filed a(n) case against Locket, Rich, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 15, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Rich Locket, Defendant |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Rich Locket, Defendant |
|
February 27, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Rich Locket, Defendant |
|
February 27, 2008 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
February 22, 2008 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
February 14, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Successfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Rich Locket, Defendant |
|
February 12, 2008 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
January 31, 2008 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
January 28, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Rich Locket, Defendant |
|
January 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.