Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Oliver Township, Mifflin Cnty, Pa, Mcveytown, filed a(n) case against Lenning, Robert K., Everetts, Deenya, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateNovember 08, 2006 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 31, 2008 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert K. Lenning, Defendant |
|
March 19, 2008 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Deenya Everetts, Defendant |
|
February 25, 2008 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
January 05, 2008 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
December 03, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
October 10, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
August 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
December 20, 2006 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.