Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, West Chester, filed a(n) case against Eckhard, Robert F., in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2008 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert F. Eckhard, Defendant |
|
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert F. Eckhard, Defendant |
|
August 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert F. Eckhard, Defendant |
|
August 08, 2008 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
July 30, 2008 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert F. Eckhard, Defendant |
|
July 09, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert F. Eckhard, Defendant |
|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Yale Darran Weinstein, Esq. Applies to Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc, Plaintiff |
|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Portfolio Recovery Associates, Llc Applies to Robert F. Eckhard, Defendant |
|
July 08, 2008 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert F. Eckhard, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.