Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Blaze Design,Inc.D B Aoverhead Door, Lewistown, filed a(n) case against Kelley, Robert, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 18, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 06, 2010 | Docket Event |
Order of Execution Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert Kelley, Defendant |
|
October 06, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
September 27, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
August 07, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Execution Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert Kelley, Defendant |
|
July 17, 2007 | Docket Event |
Order of Execution Requested Filed by Blaze Design,inc.D/B/aoverhead Door Applies to Robert Kelley, Defendant |
|
July 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert Kelley, Defendant |
|
June 15, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Robert Kelley, Defendant |
|
June 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 04, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.