Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Juniata Concrete Company, Mifflintown, filed a(n) case against Lynch, Gary, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 12, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
December 04, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
November 12, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
October 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
July 10, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 29, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 18, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
June 12, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
May 15, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
May 11, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
May 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.