Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Louis Joyce Carl D.Vogt, Lewistown, filed a(n) case against Uhland, Joyce, Uhland, Francis, in the jurisdiction of Mifflin County, PA, . Mifflin County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeMagisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateApril 11, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationMifflin County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Tammy L. Hunter |
|
May 24, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
May 11, 2007 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Francis Uhland Applies to Francis Uhland, Defendant |
|
May 11, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
May 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Bankruptcy Petition Filed - Civil Case Filed by Francis Uhland Applies to Francis Uhland, Defendant |
|
May 01, 2007 | Hearing |
Hearing Cancelled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jack E. Miller |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Joyce Uhland, Defendant |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Francis Uhland, Defendant |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Joyce Uhland, Defendant |
|
April 12, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 58-3-01 Applies to Francis Uhland, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.