Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, filed a(n) case against Yoho, Ashlee, in the jurisdiction of Lawrence County, PA, . Lawrence County, PA Superior Courts with Jennifer L. Nicholson presiding.
Case Number |
JudgeJennifer L. Nicholson Track Judge’s New Cases |
Filing DateDecember 13, 2016 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLawrence County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 07, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Appeal Filed Filed by Ashlee Yoho Applies to Ashlee Yoho, Defendant |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-3-02 Applies to Ashlee Yoho, Defendant |
|
February 22, 2017 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-3-02 Applies to Ashlee Yoho, Defendant |
|
February 22, 2017 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Jennifer L. Nicholson |
|
January 21, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Successfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-3-02 Applies to Ashlee Yoho, Defendant |
|
January 18, 2017 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-3-02 Applies to Ashlee Yoho, Defendant |
|
January 12, 2017 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Jennifer L. Nicholson |
|
January 10, 2017 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-3-02 Applies to Ashlee Yoho, Defendant |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Funding LLC |
|
December 13, 2016 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Ralph Gulko, Esq. Applies to Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.