Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Synchrony Bank, filed a(n) case against Nero, Michelle, in the jurisdiction of Lawrence County, PA, . Lawrence County, PA Superior Courts with Melissa A. Amodie presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2017 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLawrence County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
November 22, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-1-01 Applies to Michelle Nero, Defendant |
|
November 06, 2019 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Melissa A. Amodie |
|
October 29, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Unsuccessfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-1-01 Applies to Michelle Nero, Defendant |
|
October 16, 2019 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Melissa A. Amodie |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Unsuccessfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-1-01 Applies to Michelle Nero, Defendant |
|
October 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-1-01 Applies to Michelle Nero, Defendant |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Reinstatement Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-1-01 Applies to Michelle Nero, Defendant |
|
September 09, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-1-01 Applies to Michelle Nero, Defendant |
|
June 19, 2019 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 53-1-01 Applies to Michelle Nero, Defendant |
|
May 29, 2019 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Melissa A. Amodie |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.