Case Last Refreshed: 8 months ago
Ernest Nkurunziza, Ernest Nkurunzuza, filed a(n) case represented by Eric S Rothermel, Esq, against Nadine Kaberamanzi, represented by Robert M Going Jr, Esq, in the jurisdiction of Lancaster County, PA, . Lancaster County, PA Superior Courts with JOANNE MURPHY, ESQ (Judge) presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 26, 2023 |
|
Last RefreshedAugust 08, 2023 |
|
Filing LocationLancaster County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 15, 2023 | Docket Event |
AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF INTENTION TO REQUEST ENTRY OF ... PLAINTIFF'S AFFIDAVIT OF CONSENT |
|
June 07, 2023 | Docket Event |
DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVIT-CONSENT AND WAIVER OF NOTICE OF ... DEFENDANT'S AFFIDAVIT-CONSENT |
|
April 21, 2023 | Docket Event |
PRAECIPE TO CHANGE ADDRESS OF DEFENDANT WITH CERTIFICA... PRAECIPE |
|
April 06, 2023 | Docket Event |
AND NOW, THIS 3RD DAY OF APRIL, 2023, UPON CONSIDERATI... ORDER |
|
January 26, 2023 | Docket Event |
PLAINTIFF'S CRIMINAL RECORD / ABUSE HISTORY VERIFICATI... CRIMINAL RECORD / ABUSE HISTORY VERIFICATION |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.