Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, Philadelphia, filed a(n) case against Provinzano, Carol, in the jurisdiction of Lackawanna County, PA, . Lackawanna County, PA Superior Courts with James A. Gibbons presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 16, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLackawanna County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 01, 2012 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge James A. Gibbons |
|
January 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Withdrawn Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-01 Applies to CAROL PROVINZANO, Defendant |
|
December 22, 2011 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by CAROL PROVINZANO Applies to Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-01 Applies to CAROL PROVINZANO, Defendant |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Funding LLC |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Arthur Lashin, Esq. Applies to Midland Funding LLC, Plaintiff |
|
December 16, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-01 Applies to CAROL PROVINZANO, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.