Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Discover Card, Jenkintown, filed a(n) case against Perkins, Steven Mark, in the jurisdiction of Lackawanna County, PA, . Lackawanna County, PA Superior Courts with James A. Gibbons presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 12, 2011 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationLackawanna County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
April 16, 2012 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Filed by Discover Card Applies to Steven Mark Perkins, Defendant |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-01 Applies to Steven Mark Perkins, Defendant |
|
March 01, 2012 | Docket Event |
Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-01 Applies to Steven Mark Perkins, Defendant |
|
March 01, 2012 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge James A. Gibbons |
|
February 08, 2012 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Steven Mark Perkins Applies to Discover Card, Plaintiff |
|
February 01, 2012 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge James A. Gibbons |
|
December 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 45-3-01 Applies to Steven Mark Perkins, Defendant |
|
December 21, 2011 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Ernest D. Preate Jr., Esq. Applies to Steven Mark Perkins, Defendant |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Discover Card |
|
December 12, 2011 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Edward Stock, Esq. Applies to Discover Card, Plaintiff |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.