Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Lvnv Funding Llc, filed a(n) case against Deiter, Eric W, in the jurisdiction of Juniata County, PA, . Juniata County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Jacqueline T. Leister presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJuly 08, 2021 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJuniata County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
September 01, 2021 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jacqueline T. Leister |
|
August 06, 2021 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Gregg Lawrence Morris, Esq. Applies to LVNV FUNDING LLC, Plaintiff |
|
August 03, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-02 Applies to Eric W Deiter, Defendant |
|
July 28, 2021 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Jacqueline T. Leister |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by LVNV FUNDING LLC |
|
July 08, 2021 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-02 Applies to Eric W Deiter, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.