Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Heller'S Gas, filed a(n) case against Beaston, Melvin, in the jurisdiction of Juniata County, PA, . Juniata County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Tracy L. Powell presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 13, 2020 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 30, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationJuniata County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Judgment to Common Pleas Filed by Heller's Gas Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
March 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Vacated Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-01 Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-01 Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
May 23, 2019 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-01 Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
May 23, 2019 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barbara M. Lyter |
|
May 10, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Successfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-01 Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
May 07, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-01 Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
May 06, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Unsuccessfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-01 Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
May 02, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 41-3-01 Applies to Melvin Beaston, Defendant |
|
April 18, 2019 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Barbara M. Lyter |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.