Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Tionesta Borough, Tionesta, filed a(n) case against Licht, Kathryn C, in the jurisdiction of Forest County, PA, . Forest County, PA Superior Courts with The Honorable Daniel L. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateAugust 01, 2013 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationForest County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
August 09, 2018 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 37-4-93 Applies to Kathryn C Licht, Defendant |
|
November 05, 2013 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge George F. Gregory |
|
September 24, 2013 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge George F. Gregory |
|
September 10, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Tamera M. Ochs Rothschild, Esq. Applies to Kathryn C Licht, Defendant |
|
August 08, 2013 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Andrea L. Stapleford, Esq. Applies to Tionesta Borough, Plaintiff |
|
August 01, 2013 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Tionesta Borough |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.