Case Last Refreshed: 3 years ago
County Of Napa, filed a(n) Child Support - Family case against Baker, Derrell, in the jurisdiction of Napa County. This case was filed in Napa County Superior Courts .
Case Number |
|
Filing DateApril 16, 2008 |
CategoryDept. Of Child Support Services (Dcss) |
Last RefreshedFebruary 24, 2021 |
Practice AreaFamily |
Filing LocationNapa County, CA |
Matter TypeChild Support |
Case Outcome TypeJudgment |
Case Cycle Time117 days |
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 02, 2011 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
January 27, 2011 | Docket Event |
Judgment 926110-Judgment Add'l Description: Supplemental Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service JUDGMENT [926110] Motion: Additional Description : SUPPLEMENTAL Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
January 26, 2011 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
January 25, 2011 | Docket Event |
Request: Enter Default 929120-Request: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service REQUEST: DEFAULT [929120] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
December 07, 2010 | Docket Event |
Proof of Service 912310-Proof of Service Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service PROOF OF SERVICE [912310] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
November 03, 2010 | Docket Event |
Complaint: Supplemental (DCSS) 912430-Complaint: Supplemental Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service COMPLAINT: SUPPLEMENTAL [912430] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
August 25, 2009 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
August 13, 2008 | Docket Event |
Notice 912910-Notice Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service NOTICE [912910] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Converted Stat Closure Disposition Date: Aug 11 2008 Type: 944110 - Judgment/Order Manner : 941110 - Before Hearing |
|
August 11, 2008 | Docket Event |
Declaration: Default 913320-Declaration: Default Filed/Issued By: 934310 - Attorney for Child Support Service DECLARATION: DEFAULT [913320] Motion: Additional Description : Filed By ATTORNEY FOR CHILD SUPPORT SERVICE [934310] |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.