Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rgm & Associates, Bethel Park, filed a(n) case against Gaines, Sherry, in the jurisdiction of Forest County, PA, . Forest County, PA Superior Courts with The Honorable Daniel L. Miller presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateMarch 22, 2014 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationForest County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 37-4-03 Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant |
|
July 23, 2012 | Docket Event |
Certified Entry of Satisfaction Request Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 37-4-03 Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant |
|
August 05, 2010 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 37-4-03 Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant Rgm & Associates, Plaintiff |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Certified Entry of Satisfaction Request Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 37-4-03 Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant |
|
July 30, 2010 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Requested Filed by Sherry Gaines Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 37-4-03 Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant |
|
April 30, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 37-4-03 Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant |
|
April 30, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Vacant MDJ 37-4-03 |
|
March 23, 2007 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Rgm & Associates Applies to Sherry Gaines, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.