Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Funding Llc, C O Law Offices Of Hayt, Hayt & Landau, Llc, filed a(n) case against Schneider, Nadine, in the jurisdiction of Fayette County, PA, . Fayette County, PA Superior Courts with The Honorable Richard Kasunic II presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 30, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationFayette County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 10, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Cancelled Judge: The Honorable Richard Kasunic II |
|
June 01, 2020 | Docket Event |
Withdrawn Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-04 Applies to Nadine Schneider, Defendant |
|
April 08, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: The Honorable Richard Kasunic II |
|
March 05, 2020 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Nadine Schneider Applies to Nadine Schneider, Defendant |
|
March 05, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: The Honorable Richard Kasunic II |
|
February 19, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Successfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-04 Applies to Nadine Schneider, Defendant |
|
February 18, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: The Honorable Richard Kasunic II |
|
February 13, 2020 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-04 Applies to Nadine Schneider, Defendant |
|
January 30, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Unclaimed Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-04 Applies to Nadine Schneider, Defendant |
|
December 30, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Funding LLC, c/o Law Offices of Hayt, Hayt & Landau, LLC Applies to |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.