Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Midland Credit Management, Inc, filed a(n) case against Cramer, Tara, in the jurisdiction of Fayette County, PA, . Fayette County, PA Superior Courts with Magisterial District Judge Daniel C. Shimshock presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateDecember 17, 2019 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationFayette County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
June 08, 2020 | Docket Event |
Certified Judgment to Common Pleas Filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc Applies to Tara Cramer, Defendant |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-02 Applies to Tara Cramer, Defendant |
|
January 24, 2020 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-02 Applies to Tara Cramer, Defendant |
|
January 22, 2020 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Daniel C. Shimshock |
|
December 26, 2019 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-02 Applies to Tara Cramer, Defendant |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Midland Credit Management, Inc |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Daniel Santucci, Esq. Applies to Midland Credit Management, Inc, Plaintiff |
|
December 17, 2019 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 14-3-02 Applies to Tara Cramer, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.