Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc, Scranton, filed a(n) case against Brehm, Danielle, in the jurisdiction of Elk County, PA, . Elk County, PA Superior Courts with Mark S. Jacob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 16, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationElk County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 21, 2007 | Docket Event |
Civil Appeal Filed by Plaintiff Filed by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc Applies to |
|
February 21, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Donald A. Wilhelm |
|
February 13, 2007 | Docket Event |
Dismissed Without Prejudice Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Danielle Brehm, Defendant |
|
January 24, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Donald A. Wilhelm |
|
January 16, 2007 | Docket Event |
Intent to Defend Filed Filed by Danielle Brehm Applies to Danielle Brehm, Defendant |
|
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Danielle Brehm, Defendant |
|
December 12, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Danielle Brehm, Defendant |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc Applies to Danielle Brehm, Defendant |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Entry of Appearance Filed Filed by Patricia Ann Cobb, Esq. Applies to Commonwealth Financial Systems, Inc, Plaintiff |
|
December 08, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Danielle Brehm, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.