Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Mountain Laurel Fcu, St. Marys, filed a(n) case against Catalano, Angela, in the jurisdiction of Elk County, PA, . Elk County, PA Superior Courts with Mark S. Jacob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 02, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationElk County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
October 18, 2007 | Docket Event |
Withdrawn Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
|
February 14, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Donald A. Wilhelm |
|
February 05, 2007 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Unsuccessfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
|
January 17, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Donald A. Wilhelm |
|
January 04, 2007 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Undeliverable Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
|
January 02, 2007 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Undeliverable Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
|
December 05, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
|
December 04, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Mountain Laurel Fcu Applies to Angela Catalano, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.