Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Regional Ambulatorysurg. Ctr., St. Marys, filed a(n) case against Bailey, Cheryl, in the jurisdiction of Elk County, PA, . Elk County, PA Superior Courts with Mark S. Jacob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 10, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationElk County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
February 26, 2007 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Applies to Cheryl Bailey, Defendant |
|
January 10, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Donald A. Wilhelm |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Settled Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Cheryl Bailey, Defendant |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Cheryl Bailey, Defendant |
|
November 29, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Accepted Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Cheryl Bailey, Defendant |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Cheryl Bailey, Defendant |
|
November 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Issued Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to Cheryl Bailey, Defendant |
|
November 17, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Filed Filed by Regional Ambulatorysurg. Ctr. Applies to Cheryl Bailey, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.