Case Last Refreshed: 2 years ago
Rhode Island Medical Services, Pc, St. Marys, filed a(n) case against Boylan, William, in the jurisdiction of Elk County, PA, . Elk County, PA Superior Courts with Mark S. Jacob presiding.
Case Number |
|
Filing DateJanuary 03, 2007 |
|
Last RefreshedJanuary 29, 2022 |
|
Filing LocationElk County, PA |
|
Date | Type | Description | |
---|---|---|---|
March 22, 2014 | Docket Event |
Judgment Expired Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
|
July 27, 2007 | Docket Event |
Entry of Satisfaction Entered by Plaintiff Filed by Rhode Island Medical Services, Pc Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Default Judgment for Plaintiff Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
|
January 31, 2007 | Docket Event |
Judgment Entered Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
|
January 31, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Scheduled Judge: Magisterial District Judge Donald A. Wilhelm |
|
January 03, 2007 | Hearing |
Civil Action Hearing Continued Judge: Magisterial District Judge Donald A. Wilhelm |
|
December 21, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Successfully Served Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
|
December 19, 2006 | Docket Event |
Civil Complaint Issued via Hand Delivery Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Action Hearing Notice Undeliverable Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
|
December 11, 2006 | Docket Event |
Restricted Certified Civil Complaint Undeliverable Filed by Magisterial District Court 59-3-03 Applies to William Boylan, Defendant |
For full print and download access, please subscribe at https://www.trellis.law/.